FLEETWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1046699
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants for Local Community Use only.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 1995: Standard registration
  • 29 October 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £2.87k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £16.24k £1.34k £700 £1.44k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 10 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 11 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required