Trustees TAVERHAM WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1046700

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGINA CLAPSON | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Susan Beevor Mrs | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Molly Mason Mrs | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joy Glenister | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Dubbins | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Daltrey | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gill Ruggles | Trustee | 14 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
LORNA STONE | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 18 December 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.