THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (COLCHESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Buddhist religion by teaching meditation and Buddhism at public classes, training members of the charity and others towards ordination as a Buddhist, providing facilities for worship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 24 May 1995: Standard registration
- FWBO (COLCHESTER) (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE WESTERN BUDDHIST ORDER (COLCHESTER) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Jane Bond | Chair | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Barratt | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Diamond | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rakish Sharma Rose | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Force | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.35k | £43.73k | £54.69k | £52.43k | £45.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.53k | £30.65k | £50.23k | £46.98k | £34.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.39k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 13TH OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION; IN PARTICULAR (A) TO ENCOURAGE MEMBERS AND OTHERS TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING OF THE BUDDHA. (B) TO SUPPORT ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST ORDER AND OTHER DULY ORDAINED BUDDHISTS, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COUNCIL OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (COLCHESTER). (C) TO MAINTAIN CLOSE COMMUNICATION WITH AND WORK UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST ORDER AND IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER GROUPS WITH THE SAME OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE COLCHESTER DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLCHESTER BUDDHIST CENTRE
2 PORTLAND ROAD
COLCHESTER
CO2 7EH
- Phone:
- 01206546600
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window