Trustees MARINA RECREATION CENTRE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1046817

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HUGHES | Chair | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROBINSON | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEREK GRAYDON | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MAYES | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOAN ASKEY | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA TARBOTTON | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARY FENTON | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH WILES | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RAMSDALE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.