NEWPORT PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1046821
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides a suitable pre-school education to local children by providing appropriate play facilities and learning opportunities for children of pre-school age from 2 to 4

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £73,349
Total expenditure: £68,178

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 May 1995: Standard registration
  • 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 23 November 2011: Re-registered
  • 08 April 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 08 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1200076 EARLY EXPLORERS COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOLS
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NEWPORT PRESCHOOL (Working name)
  • NEWPORT PLAYGROUP (HUMBERSIDE) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £66.01k £60.82k £60.69k £50.81k £73.35k
Total expenditure £64.97k £63.24k £58.64k £52.37k £68.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £51.98k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 13 June 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 July 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 July 2022 25 days late
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 August 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 August 2021 51 days late
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 June 2020 On Time