Accounts and annual returns POLLINGTON-CUM-BALNE PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1046836

Charity reporting is up to date (257 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2025 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2025 | 254 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 March 2025 | 620 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 March 2025 | 620 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 March 2025 | 985 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 March 2025 | 985 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 March 2025 | 1353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2025 | 1342 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 December 2024 | 1625 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 January 2025 | 1672 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window