Financial history POLLINGTON-CUM-BALNE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1046836
Charity reporting is up to date (257 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £261.28k £220.06k £257.88k £332.48k £378.97k
Total expenditure £237.68k £233.74k £252.80k £324.71k £369.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.20k £4.50k £3.50k