BEACONSFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beaconsfield is constituted to educate the public in the arts: a charity which specialises in providing a resource for the development and presentation of contemporary visual art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lambeth
Governance
- 31 May 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Hilary Weight | Chair | 12 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jeremy Flack | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adelaide Bannerman | Trustee | 12 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Clarke | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sean Conrad Dower | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.77k | £167.58k | £222.96k | £109.87k | £55.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.66k | £121.07k | £148.89k | £160.38k | £119.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.15k | £187.71k | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 21ST NOVEMBER 1994.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY PROMOTING THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 NEWPORT STREET
VAUXHALL
LONDON
SE11 6AY
- Phone:
- 02075826465
- Email:
- admin@beaconsfield.ltd.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window