ALL NATIONS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to draw people to the love and power of God, nurturing and inspiring them to fulfil their purpose in life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 01 June 1995: Standard registration
- MARTON CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR TOKS SANGOWAWA | Chair |
|
||||||
Adekunle Adeniyi | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Er Jay Adudu | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adedayo Sabowale | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debra Dube | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Faisal Kinyiri | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Egbaiyelo | Trustee | 08 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sue Foster | Trustee | 08 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Caraline Rowland | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR IAN ROWLAND | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.82k | £45.98k | £45.17k | £42.36k | £40.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.64k | £39.61k | £42.80k | £46.33k | £50.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 February 2025 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 February 2025 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 January 2023 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 February 2022 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 February 2022 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND THE DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM (2) TO PROPERGATE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND TO FURTHER RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK CONNECTED WITH THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION (3) TO FURTHER EDUCATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Nations Church
Cass House Road
Hemlington
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS8 9JH
- Phone:
- 01642576846
- Email:
- ADMIN@ANCHOME.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window