Trustees METHERINGHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity Number: 1046880

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN WHITEHOUSE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Desa | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Herring | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Gilluly | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rees | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Outhwaite | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE MCGILL | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE DUGGIN | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ROLAND | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.