Accounts and annual returns SLEAFORD AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1046886
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 February 2009 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 11 February 2009 11 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 21 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 29 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time