Financial history BASTON C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1046914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.26k £2.51k £3.41k £2.62k £4.76k
Total expenditure £3.32k £3.36k £3.69k £2.57k £1.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A