Financial history PARKSIDE COMMUNITY ALL WEATHER PITCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1046918
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/02/2010 27/02/2011 27/02/2012 27/02/2013 27/02/2014
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A