Trustees THE MID-NORFOLK RAILWAY PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity number: 1046931

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Francis Robinson | Chair | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Spark | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Young | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward Smith | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David James Collinson | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karl Peter Smith | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Reginald Harold Quirk | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SIMON PATEY | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Kenneth Edward Smith | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth Saville | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Rowland Montague | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Orr | Trustee | 02 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Bernard Leonard Oakley | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.