LINCOLNSHIRE EMPLOYMENT ACCOMMODATION PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides housing and support services to promote social inclusion to vulnerable young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,186,293
Donations and legacies | £36.25k | |
Charitable activities | £992.76k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £157.29k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,149,636
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.15m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.15m | |
Retained for future use | £36.66k |
People

22 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- L E A P (Working name)
- LEAP LTD (Working name)
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Worboys | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erika Stoddart | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Sam Scoffield | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Hickson | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Wilkinson | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Allan Hall | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.21m | £1.72m | £939.82k | £1.16m | £1.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05m | £1.03m | £851.24k | £1.06m | £1.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.67k | £194 | £100.28k | £3.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £30.21k | £580.13k | £45.45k | £139.84k | £36.25k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.04m | £1.01m | £751.90k | £869.07k | £992.76k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £137.42k | £134.10k | £148.23k | £155.75k | £157.29k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.05m | £1.03m | £851.24k | £1.06m | £1.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.47m | £2.80m | £2.93m | £3.12m | £3.23m | |
|
Long-term investments | £941.38k | £941.38k | £941.38k | £941.38k | £813.00k | |
|
Other assets | £401.86k | £1.19m | £1.11m | £648.27k | £447.02k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.12m | £2.72m | £2.71m | £2.39m | £2.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/03/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/05/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2002 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/04/2013 as amended on 01 Nov 2020 as amended on 24 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED IN TERMS OF ACCOMMODATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES B) TO PROVIDE A RANGE OF ACCOMMODATION AND SOCIAL HOUSING TO MEET THE NEEDS OF VULNERABLE OR HOMELESS PEOPLE C) TO UNDERTAKE OTHER ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES WITHIN THE REGULATORS REGULATORY FRAMEWORK TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE ORGANISATION AND TO PROVIDE SERVICES FOR ITS CLIENTS SOCIAL HOUSING; MEANS LOW COST RENTAL ACCOMMODATION AS DEFINED IN SECTION 68 AND 77 OF THE HOUSING AND REGENERATION ACT 2008 HOMELESS; MEANS NOT HAVING A HOME OR AT RISK OF NOT HAVING A HOME AS SET OUT IN THE HOUSING ACT 1977 AND 1996 AND THE HOMELESS ACT 2002 SOCIALLY EXCLUDED; MEANS AT THREAT OF BEING HOMELESS AND DISADVANTAGED AS TO THEIR SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND EDUCATION NEEDS REGULATOR; MEANS THE BODY DEFINED AS THE HOMES IN ENGLAND ACTING THROUGH ITS REGULATORY COMMITTEE OR ANY SUBSIDIARY SUCCESSOR TO OR ANY ASSIGNEE OF ANY OR ALL OF ITS RELEVANT FUNCTIONS FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEAP
Homer House
Monson Street
LINCOLN
LN5 7RZ
- Phone:
- 01522 563530
- Email:
- info@leap.uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window