THE LEE AND BAKIRGIAN FAMILY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial or other aid to universities, colleges, schools, community and youth groups and religious institutions particularly in Lancashire and Cheshire to promote research and to further chaitable community and youth projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
Governance
- 05 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD LEE OF TRAFFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SADA LUCINDA PHILLIPA KILBY | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
E C R LEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY LEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
D L M LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.07k | £28.82k | £36.78k | £52.12k | £45.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.78k | £24.92k | £34.79k | £25.90k | £40.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 JUNE 1987 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 6 JULY 2006 FURTHER AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS OF THE TRUSTEES DATED 15 AUGUST 2006 AND 31 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER AID TO UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES, SCHOOLS, COMMUNITY, COMMUNITY RELATIONS OR YOUTH GROUPS OR RELIGIOUS INSTITUTIONS TO ASSIST THEM TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND TO FURTHER COMMUNITY PROJECTS GENERALLY AND SPECIFICALLY, COMMUNITY AND YOUTH OBJECTS WITHIN LANCASHIRE AND CHESHIRE AREAS.
Area of benefit
THE LANCASHIRE AND CHESHIRE AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
JS. Accountants & Business Advisors Limited
James House
Yew Tree Way
Golborne
WARRINGTON
WA3 3JD
- Phone:
- 01942 292500
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window