CHANCE (UK) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chance UK provides solutions focused mentoring and family support for children aged 5-13 with behavioural and emotional difficulties alongside group workshops designed to build social and emotional skills and resilience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,783,062
Donations and legacies | £527.34k | |
Charitable activities | £1.24m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £12.23k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,736,050
Raising funds | £433.24k | |
Charitable activities | £1.30m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,012,393 from 3 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £433.24k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.30m | |
Retained for future use | £47.01k |
People

30 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 June 1995: Standard registration
- CHANCE (Working name)
- CHANCE (UK) (Working name)
- VYP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Amanda Mulvey-Oates | Chair | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deanna Neilson | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jess Talbot | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Banton | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicci Marzec | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sutcliffe | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keisha Forteau | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Fletcher d'Arjuzon | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Otelea | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50m | £1.08m | £954.59k | £1.37m | £1.78m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06m | £1.13m | £1.13m | £1.27m | £1.74m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £209.00k | £178.00k | £95.85k | £379.64k | £1.01m | |
|
Income from government grants | £306.86k | £124.85k | £178.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £422.07k | £556.71k | £382.83k | £663.70k | £527.34k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.08m | £813.91k | £571.72k | £704.69k | £1.24m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £149 | £114 | £38 | £1.65k | £12.23k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £963.53k | £1.02m | £1.06m | £1.13m | £1.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £95.46k | £109.12k | £73.34k | £142.44k | £433.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.84k | £20.67k | £51.54k | £76.82k | £89.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £518 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.44k | £8.62k | £3.69k | £7.47k | £17.21k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £996.86k | £1.13m | £954.72k | £1.06m | £1.05m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £286.88k | £176.57k | £172.82k | £176.50k | £135.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 15 DECEMBER 2000 as amended on 24 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
The Charity's objects (the “Objects”) are: The relief of children and young persons who are at risk of becoming educationally, socially or emotionally disadvantaged; or are at risk of offending against the law; by the provision of early intervention through guidance, mentoring and support to such young persons and their families to enable them to grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society. The promotion of emotional wellbeing and good mental health for children and parents and carers in particular but not exclusively by providing information, advice, guidance and raising awareness.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chance UK
69 Old Street
London
EC1V 9HX
- Phone:
- 02072815858
- Email:
- ceo@chanceuk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window