Financial history BOSTON UNIVERSITY (USA) LONDON

Charity number: 1046951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.26k £46.38k £0 £0 £259.23k
Total expenditure £201.95k £49.01k £3.38k £5.51k £264.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A