THE TEJANI CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objective of the charity is to support charitable works carried on by trusts, associations or organisations whose objects are, for the time being, exclusively charitable. The charity achieves these objectives by making donations to such bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 June 1995: Standard registration
- 06 April 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2011 | 29/02/2012 | 28/02/2013 | 28/02/2014 | 28/02/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.26k | £3.01k | £2.98k | £4.49k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | 21 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | 05 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | 08 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 24TH MAY 1995
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window