SOMALI CARING AND EDUCATION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To employ activities to address poverty, distress, mental illness amongst our local community by the provision of advice, information, support relating to welfare benefits, health, housing, training and fundraising exercises. To assist with climate changes issues, Justice and Youth development within our community. To assist our local community in tackling coronavirus and related illnesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OMAR HASSAN SAID | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Omar Mohamed | Trustee | 27 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nafisa Mohamed | Trustee | 27 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMOUD FARAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 July 2021 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST JAN. 1995,AND AMENDED 18TH MAY.1995.
Charitable objects
RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS OF SOMALIAN ORIGIN BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE,INFORMATION AND SUPPORT RELATING TO WELFARE BENEFITS,HEALTH,HOUSING AND TRAINING.(2) ADVANCE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF SOMALI ORIGIN BY THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE AND LITERANCY CLASSES AND BY THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE WITHIN THE HOST COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED --IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOM 36 BISHOP CREIGHTON HOUSE
374-380 LILLIE ROAD
LONDON
SW6 7PH
- Phone:
- 07966743761
- Email:
- hfsca@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window