THE STELLING MINNIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1046966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Area of outstanding natural beauty privately owned by Trustees of Lords of the Manor for air and exercise by the general public and also grazed to conform with the management advice given by various national bodies. Managed by the Managers of Stelling Minnis under the Stelling Minnis Charitable Trust and with the agreement of the Trustees

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,386
Total expenditure: £5,066

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 June 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE MANAGERS OF STELLING MINNIS COMMON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laszlo Dudas Trustee 11 January 2023
None on record
Jeremy Howard Speakman Trustee 29 March 2017
None on record
JOHN HAFFENDEN Trustee
WALLACE WILSON-HAFFENDEN MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
Ivor Champion Trustee
None on record
GILLIAN MAUD PHILLIPS Trustee
None on record
ROY GRIFFIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.65k £4.52k £4.52k £9.94k £7.39k
Total expenditure £5.93k £3.65k £8.76k £1.88k £5.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TARN HOWS
STELLING MINNIS
CANTERBURY
CT4 6AD
Phone:
01227709880
Website:

No information available