Governing document THE INSTITUTION OF RAILWAY SIGNAL ENGINEERS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/11/1912 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/04/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/2013 as amended on 27 Apr 2018 as amended on 02 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF SIGNALLING (WHICH SHALL MEAN THE WHOLE OF THE APPARATUS, ELECTRICAL, MECHANICAL OR OTHERWISE, METHODS, REGULATIONS AND PRINCIPLES WHEREBY THE MOVEMENT OF RAILWAY OR OTHER TRAFFIC IS CONTROLLED) BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH, THE COLLECTION AND PUBLICATION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL AND THE HOLDING OF CONFERENCES, SEMINARS AND MEETINGS B) THE MAINTENANCE OF HIGH STANDARDS OF PRACTICE AND PROFESSIONAL CARE AMONGST THOSE WORKING WITHIN THE INDUSTRY AND PROMOTION OF IMPROVED SAFETY STANDARDS FOR THE PROTECTION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.