Trustees THE INSTITUTION OF RAILWAY SIGNAL ENGINEERS
Charity Number: 1046999

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christian Glaettli | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Morling | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Desirae Faber | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernardus Johannes Van Schijndel | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mahesh Gadge | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ramzi Fenner | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Allday | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pierre-Damien Jourdain | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roy Andrew Brammer | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Ewart | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yousef Kimiagar | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeetendra Gautamchand Dhelaria | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Pequignot Gracey | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Copperthwaite | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Bik Shun Lam | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lord Cooke | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harvinder Singh Bhatia | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Allison | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Roderick Muttram | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Upton | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bogdan Godziejewski | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul McSharry | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Power | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Walter Boshier | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Knight | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.