STARBECK C P SCHOOL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Starbeck School - school visits, activities, easter fayre, christmas fayre, book fayres and also raise money for local chariites
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 June 1995: Standard registration
- 12 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.18k | £25.11k | £24.98k | £258.86k | £258.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.74k | £23.18k | £29.47k | £28.78k | £28.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 17 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2016
(These accounts |
17 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 16 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF STARBECK SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window