THE GOOD SHEPHERD MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a local Christian charity in Bethnal Green whose services are open to all, irrespective of background or belief. Our activities include: church activities, early years groups, children's and youth work, outreach to vulnerable adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 07 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan Adrian Lynch | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Benedict Martin | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Elizabeth Gough | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pip Chisholm | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNY JOAN BOLLANS | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|||||
DARREN PRINCE | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.18k | £383.70k | £484.40k | £181.27k | £151.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £321.17k | £247.58k | £210.19k | £243.53k | £229.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD, (B) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY NEED OR OTHER HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK IN THE SAID BOROUGH OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD, (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE SAID BOROUGH OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AND (D) THE UNDERTAKING AND FULFILLING OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID BOROUGH OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS ALSO ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Good Shepherd Mission
17 Three Colts Lane
LONDON
E2 6JL
- Phone:
- 02077393822
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window