FRIENDS OF HILLSIDE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Hillside Primary School provide social events which are fun for pupils and parents. Many activities are organised to provide additional funding for items such as ICT hardware and software, playground equipment and apparatus and garden furniture and equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 13 June 1995: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF HILLSIDE (Working name)
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Khan | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Potts | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/09/2020 | 05/09/2021 | 05/09/2022 | 05/09/2023 | 05/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.66k | £2.97k | £7.08k | £11.52k | £10.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.89k | £3.76k | £3.14k | £5.23k | £15.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 September 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HELSBY HILLSIDE SCHOOL
BATES LANE
CHESHIRE
WA6 9LN
- Phone:
- 01928722991
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window