THE BASEMENT YOUTH TRUST GROUP, ROSS-ON-WYE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and provision of services to young people 11-18 years in the Ross-on-Wye district; eg drop-in sessions, professional training workshops in areas of interest to young people and informal sports sessions. Beneficiaries include deprived and harder-to-reach young individuals. Main location is 'The Venue' (formerly Y-zone) in Ross-on-Wye. The charity is also known as The Basement Trust Limited.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 09 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Christine Richards | Chair | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Daniel Kear | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Talbot James Nassau Clifton | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Richards | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK BARTRUM | Trustee | 03 May 2013 |
|
|||||
KEITH BERNARD WILDING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.15k | £23.93k | £11.83k | £24.34k | £39.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.52k | £16.93k | £11.48k | £24.16k | £24.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1995, AS AMENDED 16 MAY 1995 as amended on 17 Jan 2024 as amended on 17 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
To provide and maintain a youth centre for the purpose of helping and educating young people through their leisure time activities so as to develop their physical and mental capacities, so that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, ROSS-ON-WYE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lower Brook
Buckcastle
Bridstow
ROSS-ON-WYE
Herefordshire
HR9 6QF
- Phone:
- 07564352627
- Email:
- arichard@pt.lu
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window