ESHER CHURCH OF ENGLAND HIGH SCHOOL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1047146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of equipment and resources for educational establishment, such as plasma screens, minibus etc. Aims to provide students with opportunities not otherwise available. The charity also works with schools in Zambia where students of Esher High School fund raise for projects to improve the local Zambia school and students' educational experience.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £8,559
Total expenditure: £2,503

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey
  • Zambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 June 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ESHER HIGH TRUST FUND (Working name)
  • TRINITY SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Bennett Trustee 07 July 2022
None on record
GORDON MANICKAM PGDIP,BSC, Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
HELEN MARGARET COULSON Trustee 01 April 2014
TWICKENHAM CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF EDWARD GEORGE BROAD
Received: On time
MARY PLOWMAN'S GIFT
Received: On time
ESHER CHURCH OF ENGLAND DAY SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
FOUNDATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUNDAY SCHOOLS IN CONNEXION WITH THE PARISH CHURCH ESHER
Received: On time
Michael Boddington Trustee 01 April 2014
FISCH
Received: On time
NICKY EGGAR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £31.05k £19.90k £11.48k £7.35k £8.56k
Total expenditure £35.36k £16.10k £13.47k £5.93k £2.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 July 2023 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ESHER C OF E HIGH SCHOOL
MORE LANE
ESHER
KT10 8AP
Phone:
01372468068