HERTS VISION LOSS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Herts Vision Loss services: Home Visits by staff and trained volunteers A Hospital Information Service located in eye clinics A central Resource Centre and outreach locations Information for visually impaired people through a help/advice line A regular Newsletter and full information via our website. Support to local social clubs across the county Children's services, social clubs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £268,484 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
136 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 June 1995: Standard registration
- HERTFORDSHIRE SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- HERTS VISION LOSS LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Alexandra Hickinbotham | Chair | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sherif Adewale Ibrahim | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Picken MA, M.Sc. | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raj Visram | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Macdougall | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Taylor | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Creswick Page | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Duff Warner-Smith | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.29k | £127.20k | £287.36k | £323.34k | £335.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.45k | £126.90k | £285.86k | £323.11k | £334.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £58.00k | £58.66k | £244.80k | £253.66k | £268.48k | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £14.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAR 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO GRANT ASSISTANCE TO ALL BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN HERTFORDSHIRE OR IN NEIGHBOURING AREAS; TO CARRY ON ALL SUCH ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO PROVIDING FOR THE NEEDS OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS; AND TO CARRY ON ALL SUCH ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO THE PREVENTION, ALLEVIATION OR CURE OF PROBLEMS RELATING TO EYESIGHT.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE OR IN NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Herts Vision Loss
2 Brownfields
WELWYN GARDEN CITY
Hertfordshire
AL7 1AN
- Phone:
- 01707324680
- Website:
-
hertsvisionloss.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window