PLAY AWAY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 12 June 1995: Standard registration
- 29 November 2005: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 29 November 2005: Funds transferred to 1105377 PLAY AWAY (ESHTON GRANGE)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 MAY 1995
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT,POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE A NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR LOCAL CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window