Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ABINGER COMMON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1047205
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2010 06 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2009 04 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not Required