Financial history THE FARLINGAYE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1047217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.04k £8.48k £9.77k £3.68k £6.25k
Total expenditure £8.12k £6.87k £11.28k £4.78k £4.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A