Financial history EMBSAY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1047224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.67k £2.78k £1.71k £3.82k £2.42k
Total expenditure £3.74k £891 £852 £4.57k £3.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A