Accounts and annual returns ENFIELD EDUCATION BUSINESS PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1047294
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 July 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 July 2021 374 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required