MULLION SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB
Charity Number: 1047301
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training of young children in Sea Lifesaving
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Total income: £11,982
Total expenditure: £19,909
Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Cornwall
Governance
Registration history:
- 16 June 1995: Standard registration
- 28 November 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 28 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1195131 MULLION SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- MULLION SLSC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.63k | £11.97k | £6.38k | £4.21k | £11.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.18k | £9.47k | £3.93k | £4.36k | £19.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 15 December 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 August 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION (RULES AND REGULATIONS) ADOPTED 29 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
TO SAFEGUARD AND PREVENT THE LOSS OF LIFE, TO PROMOTE DEMONSTRATIONS AND TO ARRANGE CLASSES OF INSTRUCTION IN THE PRINCIPLES OF SURF LIFE SAVING
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window