THE ROTARY CLUB OF CARLTON TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1047317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General fund raising on local areas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £13,733
Total expenditure: £14,737

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 June 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mike Harvey Trustee 08 September 2017
None on record
David Roy Christopher Styles Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
MARTYN BYE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.85k £5.09k £11.89k £14.94k £13.73k
Total expenditure £17.89k £9.77k £9.12k £11.77k £14.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 03 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 16 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 13 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
151b Main Street
Woodborough
NOTTINGHAM
NG14 6DD
Phone:
07434746346