Derbyshire Japanese School

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As at 31 March 2023 the school had a total of 78(2022- 64) students varying in age from 5 to 18 and including some English based children. Total of twelve classes are held each Saturday consisting of Japanese and Mathematics lessons. All pupils successfully completed internal examinations and attendance was maintained at over 80%. Hold extra time lessons such as history, science and GCSE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

27 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 16 June 1995: Standard registration
- DERBY JAPANESE SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Satoshi Konno | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hiroshi Akino | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hiroyuki Taniguchi | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Syunsuke Otsuka | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hideaki Kondo | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tomoaki Sato | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mitsuya Inagaki | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Takahiro Mori | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Takaaki Kanetomo | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chika Iizuka | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Masataka Akiyoshi | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keita Yamada | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Syunsaku Koyama | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mayu Okura | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Toshiaki Tsuchiya | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Atsushi Kawada | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shinichi Nakagawa | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tomoji Shimizu | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ayaka Mori | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hidehiko Sayama | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jiro Kuroda | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenji Saito | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Toshihiro Suganuma | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ryoichiro Kotani | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Masahiro Oi | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
N Kimura | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
TOSHIAKI SAITO | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.61k | £133.56k | £123.29k | £128.90k | £134.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.84k | £119.27k | £127.26k | £127.92k | £252.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED 9 JUNE 1995 as amended on 05 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
2.1.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL TRAINING OF CHILDREN AGED 6 TO 18 YEARS OF AGE AND IN PARTICULAR TOO FURTHER THEIR KNOWLEDGE OF JAPANESE CULTURE AND LANGUAGE IN ACCORDANCE WITH JAPANESE EDUCATIONAL PRINCIPLES. 2.2.TO PROVIDE EDUCATION TO THE CHILDREN OF JAPANESE PARENTS TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE U.K.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
John Port Spencer Academy
Main Street
Etwall
DERBY
DE65 6LU
- Phone:
- 01283735182
- Email:
- misako.sato@derbyshirejs.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window