Financial history B K CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1047323
Charity reporting is up to date (91 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £95.97k £115.73k £167.30k £246.55k £127.87k
Total expenditure £76.91k £114.53k £163.44k £245.91k £263.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A