B K CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furtherance of orthodox Jewish education, relief of poverty and any other charitable activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Menachem Klyne | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bashy Nechama Rice | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Davis | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Michael Hasleton | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.97k | £115.73k | £167.30k | £246.55k | £127.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.91k | £114.53k | £163.44k | £245.91k | £263.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 MAY 1995
Charitable objects
FURTHERANCE OF ORTHODOX JEWISH EDUCATION,RELIEF OF POVERTY AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
REEDHAM HOUSE
31 KING STREET WEST
MANCHESTER
M3 2PJ
- Phone:
- 01618342574
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window