JOHN BETTS' SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PTA carries out a number of fund raising events centring around Xmas and Summer fares. We more regularly have homebake events and other adhoc events to assist individual class school trips. Every two years we have a large auction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 21 June 1995: Standard registration
- JOHN BETTS PTA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Bolton | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Osborne | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.37k | £23.99k | £87.10k | £22.65k | £76.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.34k | £26.02k | £14.89k | £98.68k | £4.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH MAY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT JOHN BETTS' SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE HAMMERSMITH, GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
JOHN BETTS PRIMARY SCHOOL
PADDENSWICK ROAD
LONDON
W6 0UA
- Phone:
- 02087482465
- Email:
- ptajohnbetts@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window