Financial history THE HARAMEAD TRUST

Charity number: 1047416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.16m £656.87k £1.31m £1.35m £704.01k
Total expenditure £418.44k £1.12m £1.52m £1.53m £1.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.13m £625.00k £1.25m £1.25m £625.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £32.74k £31.87k £60.32k £99.30k £79.01k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £418.44k £1.12m £1.52m £1.53m £1.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £2.34k £2.74k £2.83k £2.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0