Financial history NEWARK AND SHERWOOD ACCIDENT PREVENTION GROUP

Charity Number: 1047423
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £5.89k £2.83k £875 £3.53k £0
Total expenditure £1.69k £1.85k £1.78k £1.30k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A