ST.MARK'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1047426
Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pre-School Education for 2 1/2 to 4 year olds in the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £226,957
Total expenditure: £243,625

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST.MARK'S PLAYGROUP AND SCALLYWAGS TODDLER GROUP (Previous name)
  • ST.MARK'S PRE-SCHOOL AND SCALLYWAGS TODDLER GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Isabel Elgy Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Laura Sims Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Nicola Soddy Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Richard Soddy Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Joanna Klein Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Dan Kieran Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Odelia McDonald Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Beth George Trustee 09 May 2023
None on record
Rachel Schendel Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £185.57k £167.11k £179.82k £195.94k £226.96k
Total expenditure £175.89k £191.12k £178.54k £233.23k £243.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £148.24k £5.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 14 September 2024 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 14 September 2024 76 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 April 2024 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 April 2024 297 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 April 2024 662 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 May 2024 679 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 January 2022 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 January 2022 198 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 December 2020 161 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SOMERSET ROAD
SALISBURY
WILTSHIRE
SP1 3BL
Phone:
01722330382