THE CHIPPING NORTON MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding or promoting an annual festival and presenting and promoting public performances, concerts and recitals to advance the education in the art and science of music and encourage and support practical music-making, both vocal and instrumental, and performance of other art forms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 April 2024
Total income includes £1,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH COBB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Philippa Furlong | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Higgins | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Edwards | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Dyer | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wood | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Philippa Emma Ann Amelia Simpson | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hunt | Trustee | 03 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA RIGG | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA CATHERINE PIKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/04/2020 | 15/04/2021 | 15/04/2022 | 15/04/2023 | 15/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.58k | £5.32k | £9.71k | £24.10k | £23.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.22k | £2.43k | £13.09k | £12.68k | £18.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | £1.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 1995 AS AMENDED 24 APRIL 2008 as amended on 11 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND SUPPORT OF PRACTICAL MUSIC-MAKING, BOTH VOCAL AND INSTRUMENTAL, BY (INTER ALIA) HOLDING OR PROMOTING AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL AND PROMOTING PUBLIC PERFORMANCES, CONCERTS, AND RECITALS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 The Leys
CHIPPING NORTON
Oxfordshire
OX7 5HH
- Phone:
- 01608658602
- Email:
- committee@cnmf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window