REDEMPTORIS MATER HOUSE OF FORMATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs a House of Formation to train missionary priests for the Diocese of Westminster. It also supports pastoral activities carried out in the UK and abroad by the students in formation, by the staff and by the priests who have been ordained: evangelisation, catechesis, liturgical ministry, assistance to families, to elderly and housebound, hospital chaplaincy, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Israel
Governance
- 22 June 1995: Standard registration
- REDEMPTORIS MATER (Working name)
- "REDEMPTORIS MATER" HOUSE OF FORMATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Father Lorenzo Andreini | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRISTOPHER HORSBURGH | Trustee | 09 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
John David Hayward | Trustee | 09 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FRANCIS GREEN | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MATTHEW COOK | Trustee | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN WALLACH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERENCE FERGAL MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.71k | £162.28k | £137.05k | £214.72k | £175.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.66k | £161.12k | £149.06k | £174.75k | £176.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/09/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/06/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR TO FORM YOUNG MEN AND ADULTS TO THE PRESBYTERATE FOR THE NEW EVANGELIZATION AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO ESTABLISH A HOUSE OF FORMATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. EDWARDS CONVENT
11 HAREWOOD AVENUE
LONDON
NW1 6LD
- Phone:
- 02077239364
- Email:
- rmhf.lnd@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window