Accounts and annual returns CHURCH VALE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1047451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 January 2025 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 June 2023 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 June 2023 492 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 June 2023 857 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required