Financial history CHURCH VALE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1047451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.23k £51 £876 £4.82k £7.28k
Total expenditure £4.47k £3.41k £5.01k £2.12k £8.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A