Accounts and annual returns NORTH EAST CHINESE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1047452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 October 2024 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window