JOHN FIELDING SCHOOL FUND
Charity Number: 1047453
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for the John Fielding Community Special School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2016
Total income: £28,105
Total expenditure: £56,660
Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Disability
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Lincolnshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 23 June 1995: Standard registration
- 05 November 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- J F S FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.92k | £15.79k | £11.80k | £15.16k | £28.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.20k | £68.19k | £15.98k | £14.24k | £56.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 31 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 31 May 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 22 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 28 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window