Financial history QUINTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1047466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/02/2020 14/02/2021 14/02/2022 14/02/2023 14/02/2024
Total gross income £6.47k £1.43k £2.78k £2.96k £3.34k
Total expenditure £5.83k £3.65k £1.67k £2.90k £3.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A